House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 130
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 315: yeas 88, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman, Koch, Brown L
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Torr
|
|
|