Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 8, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Bill December 22, 2023
Fiscal Note December 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill January 31, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024