1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1037 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: IC 20-28-9-26. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Minimum teacher salaries. Provides that, for each school |
---|
8 | 8 | | year beginning after June 30, 2025, a school corporation shall, if the |
---|
9 | 9 | | school corporation determines that the school corporation cannot |
---|
10 | 10 | | establish a minimum salary of $60,000 for each full-time teacher, |
---|
11 | 11 | | submit a report to the department of education explaining the school |
---|
12 | 12 | | corporation's inability to meet the minimum threshold requirement. |
---|
13 | 13 | | (Current law establishes this requirement if a school corporation |
---|
14 | 14 | | determines that the school corporation cannot establish a minimum |
---|
15 | 15 | | salary of $40,000 for each full-time teacher.) |
---|
16 | 16 | | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Klinker |
---|
18 | 18 | | January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education. |
---|
19 | 19 | | 2024 IN 1037—LS 6336/DI 110 Introduced |
---|
20 | 20 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
21 | 21 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
22 | 22 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
23 | 23 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
24 | 24 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
25 | 25 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
26 | 26 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
27 | 27 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
28 | 28 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
29 | 29 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
30 | 30 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1037 |
---|
31 | 31 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning |
---|
32 | 32 | | education. |
---|
33 | 33 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
34 | 34 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 20-28-9-26, AS ADDED BY P.L.165-2021, |
---|
35 | 35 | | 2 SECTION 154, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
36 | 36 | | 3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 26. (a) For each school year |
---|
37 | 37 | | 4 beginning after June 30, 2022, if a school corporation determines that |
---|
38 | 38 | | 5 the school corporation cannot establish a minimum salary of forty |
---|
39 | 39 | | 6 thousand dollars ($40,000) for each full-time teacher, the school |
---|
40 | 40 | | 7 corporation shall submit a report to the department explaining the |
---|
41 | 41 | | 8 school corporation's inability to meet the minimum threshold |
---|
42 | 42 | | 9 requirement. This subsection expires July 1, 2025. |
---|
43 | 43 | | 10 (b) For each school year beginning after June 30, 2025, if a |
---|
44 | 44 | | 11 school corporation determines that the school corporation cannot |
---|
45 | 45 | | 12 establish a minimum salary of sixty thousand dollars ($60,000) for |
---|
46 | 46 | | 13 each full-time teacher, the school corporation shall submit a report |
---|
47 | 47 | | 14 to the department explaining the school corporation's inability to |
---|
48 | 48 | | 15 meet the minimum threshold requirement. |
---|
49 | 49 | | 16 (b) (c) A report submitted under this section must include an |
---|
50 | 50 | | 17 explanation of the financial challenges, with detailed data, that |
---|
51 | 51 | | 2024 IN 1037—LS 6336/DI 110 2 |
---|
52 | 52 | | 1 preclude the school corporation from meeting the minimum salary |
---|
53 | 53 | | 2 threshold required under subsection (a) (before its expiration) or |
---|
54 | 54 | | 3 subsection (b). The report must also describe the cost saving measures |
---|
55 | 55 | | 4 taken by the school corporation in attempting to meet the minimum |
---|
56 | 56 | | 5 salary threshold required under subsection (a) (before its expiration) |
---|
57 | 57 | | 6 or subsection (b). |
---|
58 | 58 | | 2024 IN 1037—LS 6336/DI 110 |
---|