Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1037 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/22/2023

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1037
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 20-28-9-26.
Synopsis:  Minimum teacher salaries. Provides that, for each school
year beginning after June 30, 2025, a school corporation shall, if the
school corporation determines that the school corporation cannot
establish a minimum salary of $60,000 for each full-time teacher,
submit a report to the department of education explaining the school
corporation's inability to meet the minimum threshold requirement.
(Current law establishes this requirement if a school corporation
determines that the school corporation cannot establish a minimum
salary of $40,000 for each full-time teacher.)
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Klinker
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education.
2024	IN 1037—LS 6336/DI 110 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1037
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
education.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 20-28-9-26, AS ADDED BY P.L.165-2021,
2 SECTION 154, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 26. (a) For each school year
4 beginning after June 30, 2022, if a school corporation determines that
5 the school corporation cannot establish a minimum salary of forty
6 thousand dollars ($40,000) for each full-time teacher, the school
7 corporation shall submit a report to the department explaining the
8 school corporation's inability to meet the minimum threshold
9 requirement. This subsection expires July 1, 2025.
10 (b) For each school year beginning after June 30, 2025, if a
11 school corporation determines that the school corporation cannot
12 establish a minimum salary of sixty thousand dollars ($60,000) for
13 each full-time teacher, the school corporation shall submit a report
14 to the department explaining the school corporation's inability to
15 meet the minimum threshold requirement.
16 (b) (c) A report submitted under this section must include an
17 explanation of the financial challenges, with detailed data, that
2024	IN 1037—LS 6336/DI 110 2
1 preclude the school corporation from meeting the minimum salary
2 threshold required under subsection (a) (before its expiration) or
3 subsection (b). The report must also describe the cost saving measures
4 taken by the school corporation in attempting to meet the minimum
5 salary threshold required under subsection (a) (before its expiration)
6 or subsection (b).
2024	IN 1037—LS 6336/DI 110