Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Senate sponsors: Senators Baldwin and Pol | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 92, nays 1 | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Representative Miller K added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Representative Garcia Wilburn | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Meltzer and Negele |