Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1053 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*HB1053.1*
2-January 25, 2024
1+
2+Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1053
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF HB 1053 (Updated January 24, 2024 1:20 pm - DI 106)
6-Citations Affected: IC 35-48.
7-Synopsis: Test strips. Removes provisions related to testing the
8-strength, effectiveness, or purity of a controlled substance in the
9-criminal laws concerning possession of controlled substance
10-paraphernalia.
5+DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
6+Citations Affected: IC 35-48-4.
7+Synopsis: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia. Removes
8+provisions related to testing the strength, effectiveness, or purity of a
9+controlled substance in the criminal laws concerning possession of
10+controlled substance paraphernalia.
1111 Effective: July 1, 2024.
12-Garcia Wilburn, Meltzer, Negele,
13-Miller K
12+Garcia Wilburn, Meltzer, Negele
1413 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code.
15-January 25, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
16-HB 1053—LS 6340/DI 151 January 25, 2024
14+2024 IN 1053—LS 6340/DI 151 Introduced
1715 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
1816 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
1917 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2018 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2119 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2220 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2321 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2422 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2523 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2624 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2725 HOUSE BILL No. 1053
2826 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
2927 criminal law and procedure.
3028 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3129 1 SECTION 1. IC 35-48-4-8.1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.158-2013,
3230 2 SECTION 634, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3331 3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 8.1. (a) A person who
3432 4 manufactures, finances the manufacture of, or designs an instrument,
3533 5 a device, or other object that is intended to be used primarily for:
3634 6 (1) introducing into the human body a controlled substance; or
3735 7 (2) testing the strength, effectiveness, or purity of a controlled
3836 8 substance; or
3937 9 (3) (2) enhancing the effect of a controlled substance;
4038 10 in violation of this chapter commits a Class A infraction for
4139 11 manufacturing paraphernalia.
4240 12 (b) A person who:
4341 13 (1) knowingly or intentionally violates this section; and
4442 14 (2) has a previous judgment for violation of this section;
4543 15 commits manufacture of paraphernalia, a Level 6 felony.
4644 16 SECTION 2. IC 35-48-4-8.3, AS AMENDED BY P.L.187-2015,
4745 17 SECTION 49, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
48-HB 1053—LS 6340/DI 151 2
46+2024 IN 1053—LS 6340/DI 151 2
4947 1 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 8.3. (a) This section does not apply to a rolling
5048 2 paper.
5149 3 (b) A person who knowingly or intentionally possesses an
5250 4 instrument, a device, or another object that the person intends to use
5351 5 for:
5452 6 (1) introducing into the person's body a controlled substance; or
5553 7 (2) testing the strength, effectiveness, or purity of a controlled
5654 8 substance; or
5755 9 (3) (2) enhancing the effect of a controlled substance;
5856 10 commits a Class C misdemeanor. However, the offense is a Class A
5957 11 misdemeanor if the person has a prior unrelated judgment or conviction
6058 12 under this section.
6159 13 SECTION 3. IC 35-48-4-8.5, AS AMENDED BY P.L.153-2018,
6260 14 SECTION 24, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
6361 15 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 8.5. (a) A person who keeps for sale, offers for
6462 16 sale, delivers, or finances the delivery of a raw material, an instrument,
6563 17 a device, or other object that is intended to be or that is designed or
6664 18 marketed to be used primarily for:
6765 19 (1) ingesting, inhaling, or otherwise introducing into the human
6866 20 body marijuana, hash oil, hashish, salvia, a synthetic drug, or a
6967 21 controlled substance;
7068 22 (2) testing the strength, effectiveness, or purity of marijuana, hash
7169 23 oil, hashish, salvia, a synthetic drug, or a controlled substance;
7270 24 (3) (2) enhancing the effect of a controlled substance;
7371 25 (4) (3) manufacturing, compounding, converting, producing,
7472 26 processing, or preparing marijuana, hash oil, hashish, salvia, a
7573 27 synthetic drug, or a controlled substance;
7674 28 (5) (4) diluting or adulterating marijuana, hash oil, hashish, salvia,
7775 29 a synthetic drug, or a controlled substance by individuals; or
7876 30 (6) (5) any purpose announced or described by the seller that is in
7977 31 violation of this chapter;
8078 32 commits a Class A infraction for dealing in paraphernalia.
8179 33 (b) A person who knowingly or intentionally violates subsection (a)
8280 34 commits a Class A misdemeanor. However, the offense is a Level 6
8381 35 felony if the person has a prior unrelated judgment or conviction under
8482 36 this section.
8583 37 (c) This section does not apply to the following:
8684 38 (1) Items marketed for use in the preparation, compounding,
8785 39 packaging, labeling, or other use of marijuana, hash oil, hashish,
8886 40 salvia, a synthetic drug, or a controlled substance as an incident
8987 41 to lawful research, teaching, or chemical analysis and not for sale.
9088 42 (2) Items marketed for or historically and customarily used in
91-HB 1053—LS 6340/DI 151 3
89+2024 IN 1053—LS 6340/DI 151 3
9290 1 connection with the planting, propagating, cultivating, growing,
9391 2 harvesting, manufacturing, compounding, converting, producing,
9492 3 processing, preparing, testing, analyzing, packaging, repackaging,
9593 4 storing, containing, concealing, injecting, ingesting, or inhaling
9694 5 of tobacco or any other lawful substance.
9795 6 (3) A qualified entity (as defined in IC 16-41-7.5-3) that provides
9896 7 a syringe or needle as part of a program under IC 16-41-7.5.
9997 8 (4) Any entity or person that provides funding to a qualified entity
10098 9 (as defined in IC 16-41-7.5-3) to operate a program described in
10199 10 IC 16-41-7.5.
102-HB 1053—LS 6340/DI 151 4
103-COMMITTEE REPORT
104-Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Courts and Criminal Code, to
105-which was referred House Bill 1053, has had the same under
106-consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
107-the recommendation that said bill do pass.
108-(Reference is to HB 1053 as introduced.)
109-MCNAMARA
110-Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0
111-HB 1053—LS 6340/DI 151
100+2024 IN 1053—LS 6340/DI 151