House
|
03/14/2024
|
Public Law 167
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 303: yeas 39, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 306: yeas 80, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Vinzant and Alting
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Walker K and Niezgodski
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Manning, Criswell and Miller K
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Teshka and Moed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 38, nays 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Busch added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Moed added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 75, nays 21
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Walker K and Alting
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Teshka) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Teshka
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Manning and Criswell
|
|
|