House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 50
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 250: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Byrne added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Donato
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 96, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Representatives Pressel, Speedy, Johnson added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Mayfield) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Mayfield
|
|
|