House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 52
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 39, nays 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senators Maxwell, Byrne, Leising added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Koch
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 69, nays 27
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Hall
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives May, Heaton, Lindauer
|
|
|