| 1 | + | *EH1108.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | February 20, 2024 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | HOUSE BILL No. 1108 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF HB 1108 (Updated February 19, 2024 11:48 am - DI 140) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 36-7. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Development restrictions on slopes. Prohibits a unit from |
---|
| 9 | + | preventing development exclusively on the basis of slope, if the |
---|
| 10 | + | predevelopment slope of the site is less than 25%, unless the site is |
---|
| 11 | + | within a watershed area of a reservoir that is a source of a |
---|
| 12 | + | municipality's drinking water. |
---|
| 13 | + | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
| 14 | + | Hall, May, Heaton, Lindauer |
---|
| 15 | + | (SENATE SPONSORS — KOCH, DORIOT ) |
---|
| 16 | + | January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources. |
---|
| 17 | + | January 18, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 18 | + | January 22, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 19 | + | January 23, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 69, nays 27. |
---|
| 20 | + | SENATE ACTION |
---|
| 21 | + | February 5, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources. |
---|
| 22 | + | February 19, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 23 | + | EH 1108—LS 6367/DI 87 February 20, 2024 |
---|
1 | 24 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
2 | 25 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
3 | 26 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
4 | 27 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
5 | 28 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
6 | 29 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
7 | 30 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
8 | 31 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
9 | 32 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
10 | 33 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 36-7-2-14 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
15 | | - | AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
16 | | - | 1, 2024]: Sec. 14. (a) This section does not apply to development on |
---|
17 | | - | a site that is located within an area that: |
---|
18 | | - | (1) the department of natural resources has determined to be |
---|
19 | | - | the watershed area of a reservoir; and |
---|
20 | | - | (2) is a source of drinking water for a municipality. |
---|
21 | | - | (b) As used in this section, "development" means an |
---|
22 | | - | improvement of any kind on land, including: |
---|
23 | | - | (1) residential dwellings; |
---|
24 | | - | (2) commercial buildings; |
---|
25 | | - | (3) accessory structures; |
---|
26 | | - | (4) driveways; and |
---|
27 | | - | (5) utilities. |
---|
28 | | - | (c) A unit may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or resolution |
---|
| 39 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 36-7-2-14 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
| 40 | + | 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
| 41 | + | 3 1, 2024]: Sec. 14. (a) This section does not apply to development on |
---|
| 42 | + | 4 a site that is located within an area that: |
---|
| 43 | + | 5 (1) the department of natural resources has determined to be |
---|
| 44 | + | 6 the watershed area of a reservoir; and |
---|
| 45 | + | 7 (2) is a source of drinking water for a municipality. |
---|
| 46 | + | 8 (b) As used in this section, "development" means an |
---|
| 47 | + | 9 improvement of any kind on land, including: |
---|
| 48 | + | 10 (1) residential dwellings; |
---|
| 49 | + | 11 (2) commercial buildings; |
---|
| 50 | + | 12 (3) accessory structures; |
---|
| 51 | + | 13 (4) driveways; and |
---|
| 52 | + | 14 (5) utilities. |
---|
| 53 | + | 15 (c) A unit may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or resolution |
---|
| 54 | + | 16 that prohibits or has the effect of prohibiting development |
---|
| 55 | + | 17 exclusively on the basis of slope, if the predevelopment slope of the |
---|
| 56 | + | EH 1108—LS 6367/DI 87 2 |
---|
| 57 | + | 1 site is less than twenty-five percent (25%). |
---|
| 58 | + | 2 SECTION 2. IC 36-7-4-201.4 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
| 59 | + | 3 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
| 60 | + | 4 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 201.4. (a) This section does not |
---|
| 61 | + | 5 apply to development on a site that is located within an area that: |
---|
| 62 | + | 6 (1) the department of natural resources has determined to be |
---|
| 63 | + | 7 the watershed area of a reservoir; and |
---|
| 64 | + | 8 (2) is a source of drinking water for a municipality. |
---|
| 65 | + | 9 (b) As used in this section, "development" means an |
---|
| 66 | + | 10 improvement of any kind on land, including: |
---|
| 67 | + | 11 (1) residential dwellings; |
---|
| 68 | + | 12 (2) commercial buildings; |
---|
| 69 | + | 13 (3) accessory structures; |
---|
| 70 | + | 14 (4) driveways; and |
---|
| 71 | + | 15 (5) utilities. |
---|
| 72 | + | 16 (c) A unit may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or resolution |
---|
| 73 | + | 17 that prohibits or has the effect of prohibiting development |
---|
| 74 | + | 18 exclusively on the basis of slope, if the predevelopment slope of the |
---|
| 75 | + | 19 site is less than twenty-five percent (25%). |
---|
| 76 | + | EH 1108—LS 6367/DI 87 3 |
---|
| 77 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 78 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Natural Resources, to which was |
---|
| 79 | + | referred House Bill 1108, has had the same under consideration and |
---|
| 80 | + | begs leave to report the same back to the House with the |
---|
| 81 | + | recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: |
---|
| 82 | + | Page 1, delete lines 15 through 17, begin a new paragraph and |
---|
| 83 | + | insert: |
---|
| 84 | + | "(c) A unit may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or resolution |
---|
31 | | - | site is less than twenty-five percent (25%). |
---|
32 | | - | SECTION 2. IC 36-7-4-201.4 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
33 | | - | CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
34 | | - | [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 201.4. (a) This section does not |
---|
35 | | - | apply to development on a site that is located within an area that: |
---|
36 | | - | HEA 1108 2 |
---|
37 | | - | (1) the department of natural resources has determined to be |
---|
38 | | - | the watershed area of a reservoir; and |
---|
39 | | - | (2) is a source of drinking water for a municipality. |
---|
40 | | - | (b) As used in this section, "development" means an |
---|
41 | | - | improvement of any kind on land, including: |
---|
42 | | - | (1) residential dwellings; |
---|
43 | | - | (2) commercial buildings; |
---|
44 | | - | (3) accessory structures; |
---|
45 | | - | (4) driveways; and |
---|
46 | | - | (5) utilities. |
---|
47 | | - | (c) A unit may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or resolution |
---|
| 87 | + | site is less than twenty-five percent (25%).". |
---|
| 88 | + | Page 2, delete lines 15 through 17, begin a new paragraph and |
---|
| 89 | + | insert: |
---|
| 90 | + | "(c) A unit may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or resolution |
---|
50 | | - | site is less than twenty-five percent (25%). |
---|
51 | | - | HEA 1108 Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
52 | | - | President of the Senate |
---|
53 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
54 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
55 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
56 | | - | HEA 1108 |
---|
| 93 | + | site is less than twenty-five percent (25%).". |
---|
| 94 | + | and when so amended that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 95 | + | (Reference is to HB 1108 as introduced.) |
---|
| 96 | + | LINDAUER |
---|
| 97 | + | Committee Vote: yeas 7, nays 2. |
---|
| 98 | + | _____ |
---|
| 99 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 100 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Natural Resources, to |
---|
| 101 | + | which was referred House Bill No. 1108, has had the same under |
---|
| 102 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with |
---|
| 103 | + | the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. |
---|
| 104 | + | (Reference is to HB 1108 as printed January 18, 2024.) |
---|
| 105 | + | |
---|
| 106 | + | GLICK, Chairperson |
---|
| 107 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 6, Nays 2 |
---|
| 108 | + | EH 1108—LS 6367/DI 87 |
---|