House | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 57 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 48, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senator Byrne added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 94, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Representative Hall | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Soliday, Zimmerman, Pierce M |