Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1163 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+*EH1163.1*
2+February 16, 2024
3+ENGROSSED
4+HOUSE BILL No. 1163
5+_____
6+DIGEST OF HB 1163 (Updated February 15, 2024 9:45 am - DI 140)
7+Citations Affected: IC 8-1.
8+Synopsis: Certificates of public convenience and necessity. Provides
9+that: (1) a rural electric membership corporation (REMC); (2) a
10+nonprofit corporation that is an electric cooperative and that has at least
11+one member that is an REMC; and (3) certain corporations resulting
12+from a merger or consolidation of an REMC and a telephone
13+cooperative corporation; are exempt from the requirement that a public
14+utility obtain a certificate of public convenience and necessity before
15+beginning the construction, purchase, or lease of certain facilities to be
16+used for furnishing public utility service.
17+Effective: July 1, 2024.
18+Hall, Soliday, Zimmerman,
19+Pierce M
20+(SENATE SPONSOR — KOCH)
21+January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and
22+Telecommunications.
23+January 16, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
24+January 18, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed.
25+January 19, 2024, engrossed.
26+January 22, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 94, nays 0.
27+SENATE ACTION
28+February 5, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities.
29+February 15, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
30+EH 1163—LS 6339/DI 119 February 16, 2024
131 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
232 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
333 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
434 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
535 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
636 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
737 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
838 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
939 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
1040 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
11-HOUSE ENROLLED ACT No. 1163
12-AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning utilities.
41+ENGROSSED
42+HOUSE BILL No. 1163
43+A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
44+utilities.
1345 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
14-SECTION 1. IC 8-1-8.5-7, AS AMENDED BY P.L.264-2017,
15-SECTION 5, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
16-JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 7. The certification requirements of this chapter
17-do not apply to a person that:
18-(1) constructs an electric generating facility primarily for that
19-person's own use and not for the primary purpose of producing
20-electricity, heat, or steam for sale to or for the public for
21-compensation;
22-(2) constructs an alternate energy production facility,
23-cogeneration facility, or a small hydro facility that complies with
24-the limitations set forth in IC 8-1-2.4-5;
25-(3) is a municipal utility, including a joint agency created under
26-IC 8-1-2.2-8, and installs an electric generating facility that has a
27-capacity of ten thousand (10,000) kilowatts or less; or
28-(4) is a public utility and:
29-(A) installs a clean energy project described in IC 8-1-8.8-2(2)
30-that is approved by the commission and that:
31-(i) uses a clean energy resource described in
32-IC 8-1-37-4(a)(1), IC 8-1-37-4(a)(2), or IC 8-1-37-4(a)(5);
33-and
34-(ii) has a nameplate capacity of not more than fifty thousand
35-(50,000) kilowatts; and
36-HEA 1163 2
37-(B) uses a contractor that:
38-(i) is subject to Indiana unemployment taxes; and
39-(ii) is selected by the public utility through bids solicited in
40-a competitive procurement process;
41-in the engineering, procurement, or construction of the project;
42-or
43-(5) is:
44-(A) a corporation organized under IC 8-1-13;
45-(B) a corporation organized under IC 23-17 that is an
46-electric cooperative and that has at least one (1) member
47-that is a corporation organized under IC 8-1-13; or
48-(C) a:
49-(i) surviving corporation that remains after a merger of
50-two (2) or more corporations under IC 8-1-17.5; or
51-(ii) successor corporation that is formed from a
52-consolidation of two (2) or more corporations under
53-IC 8-1-17.5;
54-that installs an electric generating facility that has a capacity
55-of ten thousand (10,000) kilowatts or less.
56-However, a person described in this section shall, nevertheless, be
57-required to report to the commission the proposed construction of such
58-a facility before beginning construction of the facility.
59-HEA 1163 Speaker of the House of Representatives
60-President of the Senate
61-President Pro Tempore
62-Governor of the State of Indiana
63-Date: Time:
64-HEA 1163
46+1 SECTION 1. IC 8-1-8.5-7, AS AMENDED BY P.L.264-2017,
47+2 SECTION 5, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
48+3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 7. The certification requirements of this chapter
49+4 do not apply to a person that:
50+5 (1) constructs an electric generating facility primarily for that
51+6 person's own use and not for the primary purpose of producing
52+7 electricity, heat, or steam for sale to or for the public for
53+8 compensation;
54+9 (2) constructs an alternate energy production facility,
55+10 cogeneration facility, or a small hydro facility that complies with
56+11 the limitations set forth in IC 8-1-2.4-5;
57+12 (3) is a municipal utility, including a joint agency created under
58+13 IC 8-1-2.2-8, and installs an electric generating facility that has a
59+14 capacity of ten thousand (10,000) kilowatts or less; or
60+15 (4) is a public utility and:
61+16 (A) installs a clean energy project described in IC 8-1-8.8-2(2)
62+17 that is approved by the commission and that:
63+EH 1163—LS 6339/DI 119 2
64+1 (i) uses a clean energy resource described in
65+2 IC 8-1-37-4(a)(1), IC 8-1-37-4(a)(2), or IC 8-1-37-4(a)(5);
66+3 and
67+4 (ii) has a nameplate capacity of not more than fifty thousand
68+5 (50,000) kilowatts; and
69+6 (B) uses a contractor that:
70+7 (i) is subject to Indiana unemployment taxes; and
71+8 (ii) is selected by the public utility through bids solicited in
72+9 a competitive procurement process;
73+10 in the engineering, procurement, or construction of the project;
74+11 or
75+12 (5) is:
76+13 (A) a corporation organized under IC 8-1-13;
77+14 (B) a corporation organized under IC 23-17 that is an
78+15 electric cooperative and that has at least one (1) member
79+16 that is a corporation organized under IC 8-1-13; or
80+17 (C) a:
81+18 (i) surviving corporation that remains after a merger of
82+19 two (2) or more corporations under IC 8-1-17.5; or
83+20 (ii) successor corporation that is formed from a
84+21 consolidation of two (2) or more corporations under
85+22 IC 8-1-17.5;
86+23 that installs an electric generating facility that has a capacity
87+24 of ten thousand (10,000) kilowatts or less.
88+25 However, a person described in this section shall, nevertheless, be
89+26 required to report to the commission the proposed construction of such
90+27 a facility before beginning construction of the facility.
91+EH 1163—LS 6339/DI 119 3
92+COMMITTEE REPORT
93+Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Utilities, Energy and
94+Telecommunications, to which was referred House Bill 1163, has had
95+the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back
96+to the House with the recommendation that said bill do pass.
97+(Reference is to HB 1163 as introduced.)
98+SOLIDAY
99+Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0
100+_____
101+COMMITTEE REPORT
102+Madam President: The Senate Committee on Utilities, to which was
103+referred House Bill No. 1163, has had the same under consideration
104+and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the
105+recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
106+ (Reference is to HB 1163 as printed January 16, 2024.)
107+
108+KOCH, Chairperson
109+Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0
110+EH 1163—LS 6339/DI 119