Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1172 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1172
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 2-5-54.
77 Synopsis: Committee on climate resilience and economic growth.
88 Establishes a committee to study the impact of climate change in
99 Indiana and annually report findings to the general assembly and the
1010 governor from December 1, 2024, to December 1, 2027.
1111 Effective: Upon passage.
1212 Hamilton
1313 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
1414 2024 IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 Introduced
1515 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
1616 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
1717 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
1818 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
1919 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2020 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2121 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2222 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2323 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2424 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2525 HOUSE BILL No. 1172
2626 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning the
2727 general assembly.
2828 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
2929 1 SECTION 1. IC 2-5-54 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS
3030 2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE UPON
3131 3 PASSAGE]:
3232 4 Chapter 54. Committee on Climate Resilience and Economic
3333 5 Growth
3434 6 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "committee" refers to the
3535 7 committee on climate resilience and economic growth established
3636 8 by section 2 of this chapter.
3737 9 Sec. 2. The committee on climate resilience and economic
3838 10 growth is established. The committee is a temporary committee.
3939 11 Sec. 3. The committee consists of the following eleven (11)
4040 12 members, appointed as follows:
4141 13 (1) One (1) member who represents Purdue University's
4242 14 Institute for a Sustainable Future, appointed by the governor.
4343 15 (2) One (1) member who represents Indiana University's
4444 16 Environmental Resilience Institute, appointed by the
4545 17 governor.
4646 2024 IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 2
4747 1 (3) One (1) member who represents the Indiana economic
4848 2 development corporation, appointed by the governor.
4949 3 (4) One (1) member who represents the Indiana department
5050 4 of environmental management, appointed by the governor.
5151 5 (5) One (1) member who represents the Indiana department
5252 6 of natural resources, appointed by the governor.
5353 7 (6) One (1) member who represents the agricultural sector,
5454 8 appointed by the governor.
5555 9 (7) One (1) member who represents the manufacturing sector,
5656 10 appointed by the governor.
5757 11 (8) Four (4) members of the general assembly who are
5858 12 appointed under section 4 of this chapter.
5959 13 Sec. 4. Four (4) members of the general assembly shall be
6060 14 appointed as members of the committee as follows:
6161 15 (1) Two (2) members of the senate, appointed as follows:
6262 16 (A) One (1) member appointed by the president pro
6363 17 tempore, who shall serve as co-chair of the committee.
6464 18 (B) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
6565 19 the senate.
6666 20 (2) Two (2) members of the house of representatives,
6767 21 appointed as follows:
6868 22 (A) One (1) member appointed by the speaker.
6969 23 (B) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
7070 24 the house of representatives, who shall serve as co-chair of
7171 25 the committee.
7272 26 Sec. 5. (a) A member of the committee appointed under section
7373 27 3(1) through 3(7) of this chapter serves until July 1, 2028.
7474 28 (b) A member of the committee appointed under section 4 of this
7575 29 chapter serves until the member's current term of office as a
7676 30 member of the general assembly expires.
7777 31 (c) A vacancy on the committee shall be filled by the original
7878 32 appointing authority.
7979 33 Sec. 6. (a) Six (6) members of the committee constitute a
8080 34 quorum.
8181 35 (b) The affirmative vote of a majority of the members at a
8282 36 meeting at which a quorum is present is necessary for the
8383 37 committee to take official action other than to meet and take
8484 38 testimony.
8585 39 (c) The committee shall meet at the call of the co-chairs as
8686 40 follows:
8787 41 (1) At least four (4) times in 2024.
8888 42 (2) At least six (6) times per calendar year in 2025, 2026, and
8989 2024 IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 3
9090 1 2027.
9191 2 Sec. 7. The committee is responsible for making all policy
9292 3 decisions relating to the duties and powers of the committee.
9393 4 Sec. 8. (a) Each member of the committee who is not a state
9494 5 employee is entitled to the following:
9595 6 (1) A minimum salary per diem provided by
9696 7 IC 4-10-11-2.1(b).
9797 8 (2) Reimbursement for mileage.
9898 9 (3) Reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
9999 10 IC 4-13-1-4.
100100 11 (4) Reimbursement for other expenses actually incurred in
101101 12 connection with the member's duties as provided in the state
102102 13 policies and procedures established by the Indiana
103103 14 department of administration and approved by the budget
104104 15 agency.
105105 16 (b) Each member of the committee who is a state employee but
106106 17 not a member of the general assembly is entitled to the following:
107107 18 (1) Reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
108108 19 IC 4-13-1-4.
109109 20 (2) Reimbursement for other expenses actually incurred in
110110 21 connection with the member's duties as provided in the state
111111 22 policies and procedures established by the Indiana
112112 23 department of administration and approved by the budget
113113 24 agency.
114114 25 (c) Each member of the committee who is a member of the
115115 26 general assembly is entitled to receive the same:
116116 27 (1) per diem;
117117 28 (2) mileage; and
118118 29 (3) travel allowances;
119119 30 paid to members of the general assembly serving on interim study
120120 31 committees established by the legislative council.
121121 32 Sec. 9. (a) The committee shall do the following:
122122 33 (1) Evaluate the risks posed by a changing climate, including
123123 34 extreme weather events, to Indiana's economy.
124124 35 (2) Evaluate the risks posed by a changing climate, including
125125 36 extreme weather events, to Indiana communities.
126126 37 (3) Identify existing research, manufacturing, technology, and
127127 38 other competencies in Indiana that address the risks and
128128 39 opportunities posed by a changing climate.
129129 40 (4) Identify opportunities to ensure Indiana's communities
130130 41 and economy, including the agricultural sector, are resilient
131131 42 to the effects of a changing climate.
132132 2024 IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 4
133133 1 (5) Identify opportunities to grow Indiana's economy,
134134 2 including the manufacturing and technology sectors, in light
135135 3 of increasing demand for low-carbon technologies, goods, and
136136 4 services.
137137 5 (6) Identify opportunities to support carbon reduction and
138138 6 climate resilience investments throughout Indiana's
139139 7 communities and economy.
140140 8 (b) Except as provided in subsection (d), the committee shall
141141 9 submit an annual report in an electronic format, not later than
142142 10 December 1 of each year, to the following:
143143 11 (1) The executive director of the legislative services agency for
144144 12 distribution to the members of the general assembly.
145145 13 (2) The governor.
146146 14 (c) The report must address the topics described in subsection
147147 15 (a) and include a description of all activities undertaken by the
148148 16 committee during the prior state fiscal year.
149149 17 (d) The committee shall submit its last annual report no sooner
150150 18 than January 1, 2027, but not later than December 1, 2027.
151151 19 Sec. 10. Funds necessary to carry out this chapter shall be
152152 20 allotted to the committee from funds appropriated to the legislative
153153 21 council or the legislative services agency.
154154 22 Sec. 11. The legislative services agency shall provide staff to
155155 23 support the committee.
156156 24 Sec. 12. This chapter expires July 1, 2028.
157157 25 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
158158 2024 IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153