Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1172 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1172
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 2-5-54.
Synopsis:  Committee on climate resilience and economic growth.
Establishes a committee to study the impact of climate change in
Indiana and annually report findings to the general assembly and the
governor from December 1, 2024, to December 1, 2027.
Effective:  Upon passage.
Hamilton
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
2024	IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1172
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning the
general assembly.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 2-5-54 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS
2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE UPON
3 PASSAGE]:
4 Chapter 54. Committee on Climate Resilience and Economic
5 Growth
6 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "committee" refers to the
7 committee on climate resilience and economic growth established
8 by section 2 of this chapter.
9 Sec. 2. The committee on climate resilience and economic
10 growth is established. The committee is a temporary committee.
11 Sec. 3. The committee consists of the following eleven (11)
12 members, appointed as follows:
13 (1) One (1) member who represents Purdue University's
14 Institute for a Sustainable Future, appointed by the governor.
15 (2) One (1) member who represents Indiana University's
16 Environmental Resilience Institute, appointed by the
17 governor.
2024	IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 2
1 (3) One (1) member who represents the Indiana economic
2 development corporation, appointed by the governor.
3 (4) One (1) member who represents the Indiana department
4 of environmental management, appointed by the governor.
5 (5) One (1) member who represents the Indiana department
6 of natural resources, appointed by the governor.
7 (6) One (1) member who represents the agricultural sector,
8 appointed by the governor.
9 (7) One (1) member who represents the manufacturing sector,
10 appointed by the governor.
11 (8) Four (4) members of the general assembly who are
12 appointed under section 4 of this chapter.
13 Sec. 4. Four (4) members of the general assembly shall be
14 appointed as members of the committee as follows:
15 (1) Two (2) members of the senate, appointed as follows:
16 (A) One (1) member appointed by the president pro
17 tempore, who shall serve as co-chair of the committee.
18 (B) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
19 the senate.
20 (2) Two (2) members of the house of representatives,
21 appointed as follows:
22 (A) One (1) member appointed by the speaker.
23 (B) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
24 the house of representatives, who shall serve as co-chair of
25 the committee.
26 Sec. 5. (a) A member of the committee appointed under section
27 3(1) through 3(7) of this chapter serves until July 1, 2028.
28 (b) A member of the committee appointed under section 4 of this
29 chapter serves until the member's current term of office as a
30 member of the general assembly expires.
31 (c) A vacancy on the committee shall be filled by the original
32 appointing authority.
33 Sec. 6. (a) Six (6) members of the committee constitute a
34 quorum.
35 (b) The affirmative vote of a majority of the members at a
36 meeting at which a quorum is present is necessary for the
37 committee to take official action other than to meet and take
38 testimony.
39 (c) The committee shall meet at the call of the co-chairs as
40 follows:
41 (1) At least four (4) times in 2024.
42 (2) At least six (6) times per calendar year in 2025, 2026, and
2024	IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 3
1 2027.
2 Sec. 7. The committee is responsible for making all policy
3 decisions relating to the duties and powers of the committee.
4 Sec. 8. (a) Each member of the committee who is not a state
5 employee is entitled to the following:
6 (1) A minimum salary per diem provided by
7 IC 4-10-11-2.1(b).
8 (2) Reimbursement for mileage.
9 (3) Reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
10 IC 4-13-1-4.
11 (4) Reimbursement for other expenses actually incurred in
12 connection with the member's duties as provided in the state
13 policies and procedures established by the Indiana
14 department of administration and approved by the budget
15 agency.
16 (b) Each member of the committee who is a state employee but
17 not a member of the general assembly is entitled to the following:
18 (1) Reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
19 IC 4-13-1-4.
20 (2) Reimbursement for other expenses actually incurred in
21 connection with the member's duties as provided in the state
22 policies and procedures established by the Indiana
23 department of administration and approved by the budget
24 agency.
25 (c) Each member of the committee who is a member of the
26 general assembly is entitled to receive the same:
27 (1) per diem;
28 (2) mileage; and
29 (3) travel allowances;
30 paid to members of the general assembly serving on interim study
31 committees established by the legislative council.
32 Sec. 9. (a) The committee shall do the following:
33 (1) Evaluate the risks posed by a changing climate, including
34 extreme weather events, to Indiana's economy.
35 (2) Evaluate the risks posed by a changing climate, including
36 extreme weather events, to Indiana communities.
37 (3) Identify existing research, manufacturing, technology, and
38 other competencies in Indiana that address the risks and
39 opportunities posed by a changing climate.
40 (4) Identify opportunities to ensure Indiana's communities
41 and economy, including the agricultural sector, are resilient
42 to the effects of a changing climate.
2024	IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153 4
1 (5) Identify opportunities to grow Indiana's economy,
2 including the manufacturing and technology sectors, in light
3 of increasing demand for low-carbon technologies, goods, and
4 services.
5 (6) Identify opportunities to support carbon reduction and
6 climate resilience investments throughout Indiana's
7 communities and economy.
8 (b) Except as provided in subsection (d), the committee shall
9 submit an annual report in an electronic format, not later than
10 December 1 of each year, to the following:
11 (1) The executive director of the legislative services agency for
12 distribution to the members of the general assembly.
13 (2) The governor.
14 (c) The report must address the topics described in subsection
15 (a) and include a description of all activities undertaken by the
16 committee during the prior state fiscal year.
17 (d) The committee shall submit its last annual report no sooner
18 than January 1, 2027, but not later than December 1, 2027.
19 Sec. 10. Funds necessary to carry out this chapter shall be
20 allotted to the committee from funds appropriated to the legislative
21 council or the legislative services agency.
22 Sec. 11. The legislative services agency shall provide staff to
23 support the committee.
24 Sec. 12. This chapter expires July 1, 2028.
25 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
2024	IN 1172—LS 6501/DI 153