1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1173 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: IC 10-21-1-10. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Classroom based violence prevention program. Requires a |
---|
8 | 8 | | school safety plan to include a plan to implement a classroom based |
---|
9 | 9 | | violence prevention program for students. |
---|
10 | 10 | | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
11 | 11 | | Bauer M |
---|
12 | 12 | | January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education. |
---|
13 | 13 | | 2024 IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152 Introduced |
---|
14 | 14 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
15 | 15 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
16 | 16 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
17 | 17 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
18 | 18 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
19 | 19 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
20 | 20 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
21 | 21 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
22 | 22 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
23 | 23 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
24 | 24 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1173 |
---|
25 | 25 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning |
---|
26 | 26 | | education. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
28 | 28 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 10-21-1-10, AS ADDED BY P.L.150-2023, |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2 SECTION 11, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
30 | 30 | | 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 10. (a) A school corporation shall develop a |
---|
31 | 31 | | 4 school safety plan in accordance with subsection (c) for review as |
---|
32 | 32 | | 5 described in section 11 of this chapter. |
---|
33 | 33 | | 6 (b) Each charter school shall develop a school safety plan in |
---|
34 | 34 | | 7 accordance with subsection (c) for review as described in section 11 of |
---|
35 | 35 | | 8 this chapter. A charter school in operation on July 1, 2023, shall |
---|
36 | 36 | | 9 comply with this subsection on or before July 1, 2024. |
---|
37 | 37 | | 10 (c) The school safety plan: |
---|
38 | 38 | | 11 (1) must be developed by a school safety specialist and the |
---|
39 | 39 | | 12 school's safe school committee, including a school resource |
---|
40 | 40 | | 13 officer if one (1) is employed by the school corporation or charter |
---|
41 | 41 | | 14 school, in consultation with the: |
---|
42 | 42 | | 15 (A) law enforcement agency; and |
---|
43 | 43 | | 16 (B) fire department; |
---|
44 | 44 | | 17 that have jurisdiction over the particular school building; |
---|
45 | 45 | | 2024 IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | 1 (2) must: |
---|
47 | 47 | | 2 (A) protect against outside and internal threats to the physical |
---|
48 | 48 | | 3 safety of students, faculty, staff, and the public, including |
---|
49 | 49 | | 4 unsafe conditions, crime prevention, school violence, bullying |
---|
50 | 50 | | 5 and cyberbullying, criminal organization activity, child abuse |
---|
51 | 51 | | 6 and child sexual abuse, mental health and behavioral health, |
---|
52 | 52 | | 7 suicide awareness and prevention, and other issues that |
---|
53 | 53 | | 8 prevent the maintenance of a safe school; |
---|
54 | 54 | | 9 (B) prevent unauthorized access to school property and |
---|
55 | 55 | | 10 interior areas or rooms, including the management of |
---|
56 | 56 | | 11 authorized visitors on school property, before, during, and |
---|
57 | 57 | | 12 after regular school hours; |
---|
58 | 58 | | 13 (C) secure schools against natural and manmade disasters, |
---|
59 | 59 | | 14 including all emergency preparedness drill requirements set |
---|
60 | 60 | | 15 forth in IC 20-34-3-20; |
---|
61 | 61 | | 16 (D) include a site vulnerability assessment for each school |
---|
62 | 62 | | 17 building; |
---|
63 | 63 | | 18 (E) not later than July 1, 2025, include the establishment of a |
---|
64 | 64 | | 19 multi-disciplinary threat assessment team; |
---|
65 | 65 | | 20 (F) include measures to expedite notification of first |
---|
66 | 66 | | 21 responders and access to school property for first responders; |
---|
67 | 67 | | 22 and |
---|
68 | 68 | | 23 (G) include a plan to implement a classroom based violence |
---|
69 | 69 | | 24 prevention program for students that: |
---|
70 | 70 | | 25 (i) promotes emotional competencies and reduces |
---|
71 | 71 | | 26 aggression and acting out behaviors; |
---|
72 | 72 | | 27 (ii) increases self-regulation and group regulation, and |
---|
73 | 73 | | 28 stimulates prosocial behavior among students while |
---|
74 | 74 | | 29 reducing problematic behavior; or |
---|
75 | 75 | | 30 (iii) develops personal self-management skills, social |
---|
76 | 76 | | 31 skills, and resistance skills specifically related to drug |
---|
77 | 77 | | 32 and alcohol use; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | 33 (G) (H) include any additional requirements required by the |
---|
79 | 79 | | 34 Indiana state board of education; |
---|
80 | 80 | | 35 (3) must be provided to a member of the board if a member |
---|
81 | 81 | | 36 requests the school safety plan; |
---|
82 | 82 | | 37 (4) must be available for inspection by the department of |
---|
83 | 83 | | 38 education's division of school building physical security and |
---|
84 | 84 | | 39 safety (as established by IC 20-19-3-14); |
---|
85 | 85 | | 40 (5) must be provided to the law enforcement agency and the fire |
---|
86 | 86 | | 41 department that have jurisdiction over the school corporation or |
---|
87 | 87 | | 42 charter school; |
---|
88 | 88 | | 2024 IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152 3 |
---|
89 | 89 | | 1 (6) must include an attestation that: |
---|
90 | 90 | | 2 (A) a copy of the floor plans for each building located on the |
---|
91 | 91 | | 3 school's property were provided to the law enforcement agency |
---|
92 | 92 | | 4 and the fire department that have jurisdiction over the school |
---|
93 | 93 | | 5 corporation or charter school that clearly indicates each |
---|
94 | 94 | | 6 entrance and exit, the interior rooms and hallways, and the |
---|
95 | 95 | | 7 location of any hazardous materials located in the building; or |
---|
96 | 96 | | 8 (B) the school corporation or charter school has conducted |
---|
97 | 97 | | 9 critical incidence digital mapping for each school building |
---|
98 | 98 | | 10 within the school corporation or the buildings that are operated |
---|
99 | 99 | | 11 by a charter school, including providing the critical incidence |
---|
100 | 100 | | 12 digital mapping information to: |
---|
101 | 101 | | 13 (i) the law enforcement agency and fire department that |
---|
102 | 102 | | 14 have jurisdiction over the mapped school buildings; and |
---|
103 | 103 | | 15 (ii) the statewide 911 system described in IC 36-8-16.7-22 |
---|
104 | 104 | | 16 through the public safety answer point, or "PSAP", |
---|
105 | 105 | | 17 described in IC 36-8-16.7-20 that has jurisdiction over the |
---|
106 | 106 | | 18 mapped school buildings; and |
---|
107 | 107 | | 19 (7) must be filed with the county school safety commission under |
---|
108 | 108 | | 20 section 12 of this chapter having jurisdiction over the school |
---|
109 | 109 | | 21 corporation or charter school. |
---|
110 | 110 | | 22 (d) For purposes of IC 5-14-3, the entities specified in subsection (c) |
---|
111 | 111 | | 23 that receive information under this section shall keep the information |
---|
112 | 112 | | 24 compiled and retained under this section confidential and shall |
---|
113 | 113 | | 25 withhold the information from public disclosure. |
---|
114 | 114 | | 2024 IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152 |
---|