Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1173 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1173
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 10-21-1-10.
Synopsis:  Classroom based violence prevention program. Requires a
school safety plan to include a plan to implement a classroom based
violence prevention program for students. 
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Bauer M
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education.
2024	IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1173
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
education.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 10-21-1-10, AS ADDED BY P.L.150-2023,
2 SECTION 11, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 10. (a) A school corporation shall develop a
4 school safety plan in accordance with subsection (c) for review as
5 described in section 11 of this chapter.
6 (b) Each charter school shall develop a school safety plan in
7 accordance with subsection (c) for review as described in section 11 of
8 this chapter. A charter school in operation on July 1, 2023, shall
9 comply with this subsection on or before July 1, 2024.
10 (c) The school safety plan:
11 (1) must be developed by a school safety specialist and the
12 school's safe school committee, including a school resource
13 officer if one (1) is employed by the school corporation or charter
14 school, in consultation with the:
15 (A) law enforcement agency; and
16 (B) fire department;
17 that have jurisdiction over the particular school building;
2024	IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152 2
1 (2) must:
2 (A) protect against outside and internal threats to the physical
3 safety of students, faculty, staff, and the public, including
4 unsafe conditions, crime prevention, school violence, bullying
5 and cyberbullying, criminal organization activity, child abuse
6 and child sexual abuse, mental health and behavioral health,
7 suicide awareness and prevention, and other issues that
8 prevent the maintenance of a safe school;
9 (B) prevent unauthorized access to school property and
10 interior areas or rooms, including the management of
11 authorized visitors on school property, before, during, and
12 after regular school hours;
13 (C) secure schools against natural and manmade disasters,
14 including all emergency preparedness drill requirements set
15 forth in IC 20-34-3-20;
16 (D) include a site vulnerability assessment for each school
17 building;
18 (E) not later than July 1, 2025, include the establishment of a
19 multi-disciplinary threat assessment team;
20 (F) include measures to expedite notification of first
21 responders and access to school property for first responders;
22 and
23 (G) include a plan to implement a classroom based violence
24 prevention program for students that:
25 (i) promotes emotional competencies and reduces
26 aggression and acting out behaviors;
27 (ii) increases self-regulation and group regulation, and
28 stimulates prosocial behavior among students while
29 reducing problematic behavior; or
30 (iii) develops personal self-management skills, social
31 skills, and resistance skills specifically related to drug
32 and alcohol use; and
33 (G) (H) include any additional requirements required by the
34 Indiana state board of education;
35 (3) must be provided to a member of the board if a member
36 requests the school safety plan;
37 (4) must be available for inspection by the department of
38 education's division of school building physical security and
39 safety (as established by IC 20-19-3-14);
40 (5) must be provided to the law enforcement agency and the fire
41 department that have jurisdiction over the school corporation or
42 charter school;
2024	IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152 3
1 (6) must include an attestation that:
2 (A) a copy of the floor plans for each building located on the
3 school's property were provided to the law enforcement agency
4 and the fire department that have jurisdiction over the school
5 corporation or charter school that clearly indicates each
6 entrance and exit, the interior rooms and hallways, and the
7 location of any hazardous materials located in the building; or
8 (B) the school corporation or charter school has conducted
9 critical incidence digital mapping for each school building
10 within the school corporation or the buildings that are operated
11 by a charter school, including providing the critical incidence
12 digital mapping information to:
13 (i) the law enforcement agency and fire department that
14 have jurisdiction over the mapped school buildings; and
15 (ii) the statewide 911 system described in IC 36-8-16.7-22
16 through the public safety answer point, or "PSAP",
17 described in IC 36-8-16.7-20 that has jurisdiction over the
18 mapped school buildings; and
19 (7) must be filed with the county school safety commission under
20 section 12 of this chapter having jurisdiction over the school
21 corporation or charter school.
22 (d) For purposes of IC 5-14-3, the entities specified in subsection (c)
23 that receive information under this section shall keep the information
24 compiled and retained under this section confidential and shall
25 withhold the information from public disclosure.
2024	IN 1173—LS 6650/DI 152