Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1190 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/08/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1190
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 10-17-12-10.
Synopsis:  Military relief fund. Provides that, for purposes of receiving
a grant from the military relief fund, eligibility criteria shall be based
on the financial need of the applicant regardless of the applicant's
income or assets.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Pack
January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public
Safety.
2024	IN 1190—LS 6749/DI 116 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1190
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
public safety.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 10-17-12-10, AS AMENDED BY P.L.53-2021,
2 SECTION 5, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 10. (a) The commission shall adopt rules under
4 IC 4-22-2 for the provision of grants under this chapter. Subject to
5 subsection (b), the rules adopted under this section must address the
6 following:
7 (1) Uniform need determination procedures.
8 (2) Eligibility criteria, including income eligibility standards,
9 asset limit eligibility standards, and other standards concerning
10 when assistance may be provided. which shall be based on the
11 financial need of the applicant regardless of the applicant's
12 income or assets.
13 (3) Application procedures.
14 (4) Selection procedures.
15 (5) A consideration of the extent to which an individual has used
16 assistance available from other assistance programs before
17 assistance may be provided to the individual from the fund.
2024	IN 1190—LS 6749/DI 116 2
1 (6) Other areas in which the commission determines that rules are
2 necessary to ensure the uniform administration of the grant
3 program under this chapter.
4 (b) The following apply to grants awarded under this chapter:
5 (1) The income eligibility standards must be based on the federal
6 gross income of the qualified service member and the qualified
7 service member's spouse.
8 (2) (1) An employee of the department who is otherwise eligible
9 for a grant from the fund must submit the employee's application
10 directly to the commission for review. The department shall have
11 no influence in any part of the employee's application.
12 (3) (2) The maximum amount a qualified service member may
13 receive from the fund is two thousand five hundred dollars
14 ($2,500), unless a higher amount is approved by the commission.
15 (4) (3) The commission may consider the following in its analysis
16 of the applicant's request for assistance in excess of two thousand
17 five hundred dollars ($2,500):
18 (A) The department's eligibility determination of the applicant.
19 (B) Subject to subsection (a)(2), facts considered in the
20 department's need determination review and award under 915
21 IAC 3-6-3 and 915 IAC 3-6-5.
22 (C) The circumstances surrounding the applicant's hardship,
23 if applicable.
24 (D) Subject to subsection (a)(2), any substantive changes in
25 the applicant's financial situation after the original application
26 was submitted.
27 (E) Facts that may have been unknown or unavailable at the
28 time of the applicant's original application for assistance.
29 (F) Other compelling circumstances that may justify assistance
30 in excess of the two thousand five hundred dollar ($2,500)
31 threshold.
32 (5) (4) The commission shall approve or deny within sixty (60)
33 days an application for a grant filed with the commission after
34 June 30, 2019, by an employee of the department. The
35 commission shall return an incomplete application with a notation
36 as to omissions. The return of an incomplete application shall be
37 without prejudice.
2024	IN 1190—LS 6749/DI 116