House | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 62 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 47, nays 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senator Koch added as third sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 94, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Senate sponsors: Senators Alexander and Goode | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Representative Miller D removed as coauthor | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Representative Haggard | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Torr and Miller D |