Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024