House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 151
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 315: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 327: yeas 90, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Yoder
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Johnson T and Ford J.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Sweet, Barrett and Fleming
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House conferees appointed: King and Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Johnson T) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 74, nays 22
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Johnson T, Charbonneau, Donato
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Representative Barrett added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Sweet L added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative King
|
|
|