House | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 66 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 48, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senator Zay added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 95, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Representative Hall D added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Representative Soliday |