| 1 | + | *EH1276.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | February 27, 2024 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | HOUSE BILL No. 1276 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF HB 1276 (Updated February 26, 2024 10:48 am - DI 153) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 13-15. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Notice of a public hearing or meeting. Provides that the |
---|
| 9 | + | commissioner of the department of environmental management |
---|
| 10 | + | (department) may, not later than 10 days after the last day of a public |
---|
| 11 | + | comment period, decide to hold a public hearing or meeting before the |
---|
| 12 | + | issuance or denial of a permit. Requires the department to provide |
---|
| 13 | + | notice if a public hearing or meeting will be held. |
---|
| 14 | + | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
| 15 | + | Soliday, Hall |
---|
| 16 | + | (SENATE SPONSOR — KOCH) |
---|
| 17 | + | January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs. |
---|
| 18 | + | January 18, 2024, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 19 | + | January 22, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 20 | + | January 23, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 95, nays 0. |
---|
| 21 | + | SENATE ACTION |
---|
| 22 | + | February 5, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs. |
---|
| 23 | + | February 26, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 24 | + | EH 1276—LS 6568/DI 125 February 27, 2024 |
---|
1 | 25 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
2 | 26 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
3 | 27 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
4 | 28 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
5 | 29 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
6 | 30 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
7 | 31 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
8 | 32 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
9 | 33 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
10 | 34 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 13-15-5-1.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
15 | | - | AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
16 | | - | 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. Not later than ten (10) days after the last day of |
---|
17 | | - | a public comment period under this article or applicable rules of |
---|
18 | | - | the board, the commissioner may decide, based on information |
---|
19 | | - | received during the public comment period, to hold a public |
---|
20 | | - | hearing or meeting before the issuance or denial of a permit. If the |
---|
21 | | - | commissioner decides to hold a public hearing or meeting under |
---|
22 | | - | this section, the department shall: |
---|
23 | | - | (1) immediately notify the applicant of the decision to hold the |
---|
24 | | - | public hearing or meeting; and |
---|
25 | | - | (2) as soon as practicable, provide notice to the applicant and |
---|
26 | | - | any interested persons of the date, time, and location of the |
---|
27 | | - | public hearing or meeting. |
---|
28 | | - | HEA 1276 Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
29 | | - | President of the Senate |
---|
30 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
31 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
32 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
33 | | - | HEA 1276 |
---|
| 40 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 13-15-5-1.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
| 41 | + | 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
| 42 | + | 3 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. Not later than ten (10) days after the last day of |
---|
| 43 | + | 4 a public comment period under this article or applicable rules of |
---|
| 44 | + | 5 the board, the commissioner may decide, based on information |
---|
| 45 | + | 6 received during the public comment period, to hold a public |
---|
| 46 | + | 7 hearing or meeting before the issuance or denial of a permit. If the |
---|
| 47 | + | 8 commissioner decides to hold a public hearing or meeting under |
---|
| 48 | + | 9 this section, the department shall: |
---|
| 49 | + | 10 (1) immediately notify the applicant of the decision to hold the |
---|
| 50 | + | 11 public hearing or meeting; and |
---|
| 51 | + | 12 (2) as soon as practicable, provide notice to the applicant and |
---|
| 52 | + | 13 any interested persons of the date, time, and location of the |
---|
| 53 | + | 14 public hearing or meeting. |
---|
| 54 | + | EH 1276—LS 6568/DI 125 2 |
---|
| 55 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 56 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Environmental Affairs, to which |
---|
| 57 | + | was referred House Bill 1276, has had the same under consideration |
---|
| 58 | + | and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the |
---|
| 59 | + | recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 60 | + | (Reference is to HB 1276 as introduced.) |
---|
| 61 | + | MORRISON |
---|
| 62 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0 |
---|
| 63 | + | _____ |
---|
| 64 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 65 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs, |
---|
| 66 | + | to which was referred House Bill No. 1276, has had the same under |
---|
| 67 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with |
---|
| 68 | + | the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. |
---|
| 69 | + | (Reference is to HB 1276 as printed January 18, 2024.) |
---|
| 70 | + | |
---|
| 71 | + | NIEMEYER, Chairperson |
---|
| 72 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 |
---|
| 73 | + | EH 1276—LS 6568/DI 125 |
---|