Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1276 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/18/2024

                    *HB1276.1*
January 18, 2024
HOUSE BILL No. 1276
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1276 (Updated January 17, 2024 1:44 pm - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 13-15.
Synopsis:  Notice of a public hearing or meeting. Provides that the
commissioner of the department of environmental management
(department) may, not later than 10 days after the last day of a public
comment period, decide to hold a public hearing or meeting before the
issuance or denial of a permit. Requires the department to provide
notice if a public hearing or meeting will be held.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Soliday
January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
January 18, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
HB 1276—LS 6568/DI 125  January 18, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1276
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
environmental law.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 13-15-5-1.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. Not later than ten (10) days after the last day of
4 a public comment period under this article or applicable rules of
5 the board, the commissioner may decide, based on information
6 received during the public comment period, to hold a public
7 hearing or meeting before the issuance or denial of a permit. If the
8 commissioner decides to hold a public hearing or meeting under
9 this section, the department shall:
10 (1) immediately notify the applicant of the decision to hold the
11 public hearing or meeting; and
12 (2) as soon as practicable, provide notice to the applicant and
13 any interested persons of the date, time, and location of the
14 public hearing or meeting.
HB 1276—LS 6568/DI 125 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Environmental Affairs, to which
was referred House Bill 1276, has had the same under consideration
and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the
recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1276 as introduced.) 
MORRISON
Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0         
HB 1276—LS 6568/DI 125