*EH1276.1* February 27, 2024 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1276 _____ DIGEST OF HB 1276 (Updated February 26, 2024 10:48 am - DI 153) Citations Affected: IC 13-15. Synopsis: Notice of a public hearing or meeting. Provides that the commissioner of the department of environmental management (department) may, not later than 10 days after the last day of a public comment period, decide to hold a public hearing or meeting before the issuance or denial of a permit. Requires the department to provide notice if a public hearing or meeting will be held. Effective: July 1, 2024. Soliday, Hall (SENATE SPONSOR — KOCH) January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs. January 18, 2024, reported — Do Pass. January 22, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. January 23, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 95, nays 0. SENATE ACTION February 5, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs. February 26, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. EH 1276—LS 6568/DI 125 February 27, 2024 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1276 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning environmental law. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 13-15-5-1.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 3 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. Not later than ten (10) days after the last day of 4 a public comment period under this article or applicable rules of 5 the board, the commissioner may decide, based on information 6 received during the public comment period, to hold a public 7 hearing or meeting before the issuance or denial of a permit. If the 8 commissioner decides to hold a public hearing or meeting under 9 this section, the department shall: 10 (1) immediately notify the applicant of the decision to hold the 11 public hearing or meeting; and 12 (2) as soon as practicable, provide notice to the applicant and 13 any interested persons of the date, time, and location of the 14 public hearing or meeting. EH 1276—LS 6568/DI 125 2 COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Environmental Affairs, to which was referred House Bill 1276, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill do pass. (Reference is to HB 1276 as introduced.) MORRISON Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0 _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Madam President: The Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs, to which was referred House Bill No. 1276, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. (Reference is to HB 1276 as printed January 18, 2024.) NIEMEYER, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 EH 1276—LS 6568/DI 125