House
|
03/12/2024
|
Public Law 88
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 245: yeas 66, nays 20
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 28, nays 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Walker K added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Baldwin added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Alexander added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 155: yeas 8, nays 41
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 91, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Gaskill
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Harris) failed; Roll Call 56: yeas 25, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative Pierce K
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Speedy and Teshka
|
|
|