Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1284 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2024
Fiscal Note February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Bill January 9, 2024
Fiscal Note January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024