House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 68
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Buck
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Representative Pressel added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Smaltz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Authored by Representative Smaltz
|
|
|