Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 23, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024
Fiscal Note January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024