House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 69
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Becker added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Cosponsor: Senator Donato
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Walker G, Johnson T, Gaskill
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Representative Jackson added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Jackson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Goss-Reaves added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representative Olthoff added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Authored by Representative Lauer
|
|
|