House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 161
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 335: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 357: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Qaddoura added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Randolph Lonnie M removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Qaddoura removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Lehman, Smaltz and Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Fleming
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Qaddoura and Busch
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Johnson T and Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 45, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senator Walker K added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Johnson T and Busch
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Fleming added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Authored by Representative Carbaugh
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Lehman and Smaltz
|
|
|