Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 11, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024
Fiscal Note January 10, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024