Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1359 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/11/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6982	NOTE PREPARED: Mar 11, 2024
BILL NUMBER: HB 1359	BILL AMENDED: Mar 8, 2024
SUBJECT: Probate. 
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Carbaugh	BILL STATUS: Enrolled
FIRST SPONSOR: Sen. Johnson T
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: Local
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: The bill extends insurance coverage on property transferred by a transfer on death
transfer following the death of the insured after June 30, 2025, for property and casualty insurance and
liability insurance other than title insurance and certain insurance relating to bonds and mortgages.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures:
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: This bill’s provisions may result in a potential minor increase in the
administrative workload for county auditors to the extent they have to account for multiple owners in their
tax and billing software systems. Under this bill’s provisions, this scenario might occur when the beneficiary
fails to file an affidavit upon the death of the owner with the county recorder or there is a delay in recording
the affidavit and both the beneficiary (or beneficiaries) of the real property and the estate of the deceased
owner are jointly responsible for property taxes assessed on the real property.
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected:
Local Agencies Affected: County auditors and county recorders. 
HB 1359	1 Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Jasmine Noel,  317-234-1360; James Johnson, 317-232-9869.
HB 1359	2