Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1374 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1374
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 12-15.
77 Synopsis: Medicaid claim payments for nursing facilities. Beginning
88 July 1, 2024, and ending December 31, 2024, requires the office of the
99 secretary of family and social services (office) and a managed care
1010 organization to pay 87.5% of a claim to a nursing facility if the claim
1111 is not paid within a specified time. Requires the office to assess a
1212 managed care organization a fine of $4,800 per claim for failure to pay
1313 a nursing facility claim within the required time. Repeals a provision
1414 concerning reporting that has expired.
1515 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1616 Karickhoff
1717 January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health.
1818 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 Introduced
1919 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2020 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2121 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2222 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2323 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2424 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2525 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2626 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2727 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2828 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2929 HOUSE BILL No. 1374
3030 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3131 Medicaid.
3232 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3333 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-15-5-17.5 IS REPEALED [EFFECTIVE JULY
3434 2 1, 2024]. Sec. 17.5. (a) The office shall report on its progress on the
3535 3 development of a risk based managed care program or capitated
3636 4 managed care program for Medicaid recipients who are eligible to
3737 5 participate in the Medicare program (42 U.S.C. 1395 et seq.) and
3838 6 receive nursing facility services to the interim study committee on
3939 7 public health, behavioral health, and human services before November
4040 8 1, 2021.
4141 9 (b) Not later than February 1, 2022, the office shall report the
4242 10 following information and analysis to the legislative council and budget
4343 11 committee (in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6) regarding the
4444 12 implementation of a risk based managed care program or capitated
4545 13 managed care program for Medicaid recipients who are eligible to
4646 14 participate in the Medicare program (42 U.S.C. 1395 et seq.) and
4747 15 receive nursing facility services, as follows:
4848 16 (1) The projected utilization of home and community based
4949 17 services and institutional services for the four (4) years following
5050 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 2
5151 1 implementation, and including, but not limited to, information on:
5252 2 (A) provider network adequacy;
5353 3 (B) family caregiver programming; and
5454 4 (C) costs and funding sources associated with creating and
5555 5 maintaining adequate provider networks and family caregiving
5656 6 programming.
5757 7 (2) How administrative processes, including service approval and
5858 8 billing processes, between managed care entities and providers of
5959 9 services will be addressed or streamlined in a risk based managed
6060 10 care program or capitated managed care program, with specific
6161 11 discussion of uniform provider credentialing, the potential of a
6262 12 single claims processing portal, and prior authorization processes.
6363 13 (3) Projected total spending for a risk based managed care
6464 14 program or capitated managed care program for the four (4) years
6565 15 following implementation. Such information shall include the
6666 16 identification of and impact on each source of state matching
6767 17 funds and overall impact on the state general fund.
6868 18 (4) The expected financial impacts of a risk based managed care
6969 19 program or capitated managed care program on the available
7070 20 amounts and use of the nursing facility quality assessment fee and
7171 21 supplemental payments to nursing facilities that are owned and
7272 22 operated by a governmental entity. Such information shall include
7373 23 an analysis on whether either of these funding streams will be
7474 24 diverted for uses other than the uses prior to implementation of a
7575 25 risk based managed care program or capitated managed care
7676 26 program and the effects on access to acute and post-acute care
7777 27 services due to the expected financial impacts.
7878 28 (c) A request for proposal for the procurement of a Medicaid
7979 29 program to enroll a Medicaid recipient who is eligible to participate in
8080 30 the Medicare program (42 U.S.C. 1395 et seq.) and receives nursing
8181 31 facility services in a risk based managed care program or capitated
8282 32 managed care program may not be issued until the request for proposal
8383 33 has been reviewed by the budget committee.
8484 34 (d) After the review of a request for proposal by the budget
8585 35 committee under subsection (c), the office may not enter into a final
8686 36 contract that would implement a program described in subsection (c)
8787 37 before January 31, 2023.
8888 38 SECTION 2. IC 12-15-13-1.5, AS AMENDED BY P.L.42-2011,
8989 39 SECTION 29, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
9090 40 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. (a) This section:
9191 41 (1) applies only to claims submitted for payment by nursing
9292 42 facilities; and
9393 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 3
9494 1 (2) does not apply when section 1.8 of this chapter is in effect.
9595 2 (b) If the office:
9696 3 (1) fails to pay a clean claim in the time required under section
9797 4 1(b) of this chapter; or
9898 5 (2) denies or suspends a claim that is subsequently determined to
9999 6 have been a clean claim when the claim was filed;
100100 7 the office shall pay the provider interest on the Medicaid allowable
101101 8 amount of the claim.
102102 9 (c) Interest paid under subsection (b):
103103 10 (1) accrues beginning:
104104 11 (A) twenty-two (22) days after the date the claim is filed under
105105 12 section 1(b)(1) of this chapter; or
106106 13 (B) thirty-one (31) days after the date the claim is filed under
107107 14 section 1(b)(2) of this chapter; and
108108 15 (2) stops accruing on the date the office pays the claim.
109109 16 (d) The office shall pay interest under subsection (b) at the same
110110 17 rate as determined under IC 12-15-21-3(7)(A).
111111 18 SECTION 3. IC 12-15-13-1.8 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
112112 19 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
113113 20 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.8. (a) This section applies:
114114 21 (1) beginning July 1, 2024, and ending December 31, 2024;
115115 22 and
116116 23 (2) to claims submitted for payment by nursing facilities.
117117 24 A claim under this section is not required to meet the requirements
118118 25 of a clean claim.
119119 26 (b) If the office fails to pay a claim in the time required under
120120 27 section 1(b) of this chapter, the office shall reimburse the nursing
121121 28 facility at least eighty-seven and one-half percent (87.5%) of the
122122 29 claim:
123123 30 (1) twenty-two (22) days after the date the claim is filed under
124124 31 section 1(b)(1) of this chapter; or
125125 32 (2) thirty-one (31) days after the date the claim is filed under
126126 33 section 1(b)(2) of this chapter.
127127 34 (c) The office of the secretary shall fine a managed care
128128 35 organization that fails to pay a claim in the time required under
129129 36 section 1(b) of this chapter four thousand eight hundred dollars
130130 37 ($4,800) per claim. If the managed care organization continuously
131131 38 fails to pay claims to a nursing facility in accordance with this
132132 39 chapter, the office of the secretary may stop assigning Medicaid
133133 40 recipients to the managed care organization for the provision of
134134 41 services.
135135 42 (d) If a claim for which a payment was made under subsection
136136 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 4
137137 1 (b) is ultimately denied for a reason other than an administrative
138138 2 issue with the submission of the claim, the office and the nursing
139139 3 facility shall agree to the manner in which the payment under
140140 4 subsection (b) is to be recouped from the nursing facility.
141141 5 (e) This section expires January 1, 2025.
142142 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104