Introduced Version HOUSE BILL No. 1374 _____ DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL Citations Affected: IC 12-15. Synopsis: Medicaid claim payments for nursing facilities. Beginning July 1, 2024, and ending December 31, 2024, requires the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) and a managed care organization to pay 87.5% of a claim to a nursing facility if the claim is not paid within a specified time. Requires the office to assess a managed care organization a fine of $4,800 per claim for failure to pay a nursing facility claim within the required time. Repeals a provision concerning reporting that has expired. Effective: July 1, 2024. Karickhoff January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health. 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 Introduced Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. HOUSE BILL No. 1374 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning Medicaid. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-15-5-17.5 IS REPEALED [EFFECTIVE JULY 2 1, 2024]. Sec. 17.5. (a) The office shall report on its progress on the 3 development of a risk based managed care program or capitated 4 managed care program for Medicaid recipients who are eligible to 5 participate in the Medicare program (42 U.S.C. 1395 et seq.) and 6 receive nursing facility services to the interim study committee on 7 public health, behavioral health, and human services before November 8 1, 2021. 9 (b) Not later than February 1, 2022, the office shall report the 10 following information and analysis to the legislative council and budget 11 committee (in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6) regarding the 12 implementation of a risk based managed care program or capitated 13 managed care program for Medicaid recipients who are eligible to 14 participate in the Medicare program (42 U.S.C. 1395 et seq.) and 15 receive nursing facility services, as follows: 16 (1) The projected utilization of home and community based 17 services and institutional services for the four (4) years following 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 2 1 implementation, and including, but not limited to, information on: 2 (A) provider network adequacy; 3 (B) family caregiver programming; and 4 (C) costs and funding sources associated with creating and 5 maintaining adequate provider networks and family caregiving 6 programming. 7 (2) How administrative processes, including service approval and 8 billing processes, between managed care entities and providers of 9 services will be addressed or streamlined in a risk based managed 10 care program or capitated managed care program, with specific 11 discussion of uniform provider credentialing, the potential of a 12 single claims processing portal, and prior authorization processes. 13 (3) Projected total spending for a risk based managed care 14 program or capitated managed care program for the four (4) years 15 following implementation. Such information shall include the 16 identification of and impact on each source of state matching 17 funds and overall impact on the state general fund. 18 (4) The expected financial impacts of a risk based managed care 19 program or capitated managed care program on the available 20 amounts and use of the nursing facility quality assessment fee and 21 supplemental payments to nursing facilities that are owned and 22 operated by a governmental entity. Such information shall include 23 an analysis on whether either of these funding streams will be 24 diverted for uses other than the uses prior to implementation of a 25 risk based managed care program or capitated managed care 26 program and the effects on access to acute and post-acute care 27 services due to the expected financial impacts. 28 (c) A request for proposal for the procurement of a Medicaid 29 program to enroll a Medicaid recipient who is eligible to participate in 30 the Medicare program (42 U.S.C. 1395 et seq.) and receives nursing 31 facility services in a risk based managed care program or capitated 32 managed care program may not be issued until the request for proposal 33 has been reviewed by the budget committee. 34 (d) After the review of a request for proposal by the budget 35 committee under subsection (c), the office may not enter into a final 36 contract that would implement a program described in subsection (c) 37 before January 31, 2023. 38 SECTION 2. IC 12-15-13-1.5, AS AMENDED BY P.L.42-2011, 39 SECTION 29, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE 40 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. (a) This section: 41 (1) applies only to claims submitted for payment by nursing 42 facilities; and 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 3 1 (2) does not apply when section 1.8 of this chapter is in effect. 2 (b) If the office: 3 (1) fails to pay a clean claim in the time required under section 4 1(b) of this chapter; or 5 (2) denies or suspends a claim that is subsequently determined to 6 have been a clean claim when the claim was filed; 7 the office shall pay the provider interest on the Medicaid allowable 8 amount of the claim. 9 (c) Interest paid under subsection (b): 10 (1) accrues beginning: 11 (A) twenty-two (22) days after the date the claim is filed under 12 section 1(b)(1) of this chapter; or 13 (B) thirty-one (31) days after the date the claim is filed under 14 section 1(b)(2) of this chapter; and 15 (2) stops accruing on the date the office pays the claim. 16 (d) The office shall pay interest under subsection (b) at the same 17 rate as determined under IC 12-15-21-3(7)(A). 18 SECTION 3. IC 12-15-13-1.8 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA 19 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS 20 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.8. (a) This section applies: 21 (1) beginning July 1, 2024, and ending December 31, 2024; 22 and 23 (2) to claims submitted for payment by nursing facilities. 24 A claim under this section is not required to meet the requirements 25 of a clean claim. 26 (b) If the office fails to pay a claim in the time required under 27 section 1(b) of this chapter, the office shall reimburse the nursing 28 facility at least eighty-seven and one-half percent (87.5%) of the 29 claim: 30 (1) twenty-two (22) days after the date the claim is filed under 31 section 1(b)(1) of this chapter; or 32 (2) thirty-one (31) days after the date the claim is filed under 33 section 1(b)(2) of this chapter. 34 (c) The office of the secretary shall fine a managed care 35 organization that fails to pay a claim in the time required under 36 section 1(b) of this chapter four thousand eight hundred dollars 37 ($4,800) per claim. If the managed care organization continuously 38 fails to pay claims to a nursing facility in accordance with this 39 chapter, the office of the secretary may stop assigning Medicaid 40 recipients to the managed care organization for the provision of 41 services. 42 (d) If a claim for which a payment was made under subsection 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104 4 1 (b) is ultimately denied for a reason other than an administrative 2 issue with the submission of the claim, the office and the nursing 3 facility shall agree to the manner in which the payment under 4 subsection (b) is to be recouped from the nursing facility. 5 (e) This section expires January 1, 2025. 2024 IN 1374—LS 7005/DI 104