Senate | 01/25/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 64, nays 30 | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Representatives Morrison, Criswell C, Haggard C added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Amendment #1 (Bauer M) failed; Roll Call 16: yeas 28, nays 66 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Authored by Representative Lindauer |