Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1399 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*HB1399.1*
2-January 18, 2024
1+
2+Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1399
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF HB 1399 (Updated January 17, 2024 5:29 pm - DI 150)
6-Citations Affected: IC 13-11; IC 13-13.
5+DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
6+Citations Affected: IC 13-11-2-163.2; IC 13-13-8-16.
77 Synopsis: PFAS chemicals. Defines "PFAS chemicals" and requires
88 the environmental rules board to use the definition in certain rules
99 concerning industrial processes and research and development.
1010 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1111 Lindauer
1212 January 11, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
13-January 18, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass.
14-HB 1399—LS 6830/DI 150 January 18, 2024
13+2024 IN 1399—LS 6830/DI 150 Introduced
1514 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
1615 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
1716 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
1817 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
1918 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2019 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2120 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2221 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2322 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2423 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2524 HOUSE BILL No. 1399
2625 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
2726 environmental law.
2827 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
2928 1 SECTION 1. IC 13-11-2-163.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
3029 2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3130 3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 163.2. (a) "PFAS chemicals", for
3231 4 purposes of IC 13-13-8-16, means:
3332 5 (1) a non-polymeric perfluoroalkyl substance;
34-6 (2) a non-polymeric saturated polyfluoroalkyl substance; or
33+6 (2) a non-polymeric polyfluoroalkyl substance; or
3534 7 (3) side-chain fluorinated polymers;
3635 8 a molecule of which contains at least two (2) fully fluorinated
3736 9 sequential carbon atoms.
38-10 (b) The term does not include gases and substances that become
39-11 gases in use.
37+10 (b) The term does not include gases or volatile liquids at
38+11 ambient conditions.
4039 12 SECTION 2. IC 13-13-8-16 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
4140 13 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
4241 14 1, 2024]: Sec. 16. The board shall use the definition of "PFAS
4342 15 chemicals" set forth in IC 13-11-2-163.2 when adopting a rule
4443 16 concerning:
4544 17 (1) perfluoroalkyl substances; or
46-HB 1399—LS 6830/DI 150 2
45+2024 IN 1399—LS 6830/DI 150 2
4746 1 (2) polyfluoroalkyl substances;
4847 2 that are used or produced in industrial processes or research and
4948 3 development.
50-HB 1399—LS 6830/DI 150 3
51-COMMITTEE REPORT
52-Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Environmental Affairs, to which
53-was referred House Bill 1399, has had the same under consideration
54-and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the
55-recommendation that said bill be amended as follows:
56-Page 1, delete lines 6 through 11, begin a new line block indented
57-and insert:
58-"(2) a non-polymeric saturated polyfluoroalkyl substance; or
59-(3) side-chain fluorinated polymers;
60-a molecule of which contains at least two (2) fully fluorinated
61-sequential carbon atoms.
62-(b) The term does not include gases and substances that become
63-gases in use.".
64-and when so amended that said bill do pass.
65-(Reference is to HB 1399 as introduced.)
66-MORRISON
67-Committee Vote: yeas 7, nays 5.
68-HB 1399—LS 6830/DI 150
49+2024 IN 1399—LS 6830/DI 150