House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 71
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Glick added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Baldwin added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Zay added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Carrasco
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Negele added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Moseley added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Representative Pierce K added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Authored by Representative Gore
|
|
|