Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024
Fiscal Note January 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024