House
|
03/12/2024
|
Public Law 91
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 303: yeas 87, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 30, nays 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 249: yeas 11, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senator Becker removed as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Becker
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 94, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment #2 (King) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representative King J added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representative Barrett removed as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Authored by Representative Fleming
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Barrett, Ledbetter, Bauer M
|
|
|