Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1426 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2024
Fiscal Note March 5, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note February 5, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 11, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024