Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senator Alexander added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 63, nays 32 | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Representative Miller K added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Representative Miller D removed as coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Authored by Representative Hall | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Jeter, Karickhoff, Miller D |