House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senators Vinzant and Pol added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Baird and King
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Barrett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senators Dernulc, Qaddoura, Donato added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Goode added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Alting added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senators Maxwell, Taylor G, Bohacek, Alexander, Deery, Doriot, Brown L, Koch added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Hunley added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Young M added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senators Crane, Busch, Johnson T, Buck, Gaskill added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senators Carrasco and Bassler added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Walker K added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senators Baldwin, Crider, Charbonneau
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Garten
|
|
|