*ES0010.1* February 13, 2024 ENGROSSED SENATE BILL No. 10 _____ DIGEST OF SB 10 (Updated February 13, 2024 10:58 am - DI 147) Citations Affected: IC 12-7; IC 12-29. Synopsis: Community cares initiative grant pilot program. Establishes the community cares initiative grant pilot program for the purpose of assisting in the costs of starting or expanding mobile integrated health care programs and mobile crisis teams in Indiana. Establishes the community cares initiative fund. Effective: July 1, 2024. Baldwin, Crider, Charbonneau, Garten, Walker K, Carrasco, Bassler, Crane, Busch, Johnson T, Buck, Gaskill, Niezgodski, Young M, Becker, Ford J.D., Hunley, Maxwell, Taylor G, Bohacek, Alexander, Deery, Doriot, Brown L, Koch, Alting, Goode, Messmer, Randolph Lonnie M, Dernulc, Qaddoura, Donato, Yoder, Vinzant, Pol Jr. (HOUSE SPONSORS — BARRETT, BAIRD, KING) January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services. January 25, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations. February 1, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass. February 5, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. February 6, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 48, nays 0. HOUSE ACTION February 12, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health. February 13, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to Rule 127. ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104 February 13, 2024 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. ENGROSSED SENATE BILL No. 10 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning human services and to make an appropriation. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-7-2-131.4, AS ADDED BY P.L.207-2021, 2 SECTION 3, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 131.4. "Mobile crisis team", for purposes of 4 IC 12-21-8 and IC 12-29-5, has the meaning set forth in IC 12-21-8-3. 5 SECTION 2. IC 12-7-2-131.6 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA 6 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS 7 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 131.6. "Mobile integrated health 8 care", for purposes of IC 12-29-5, has the meaning set forth in 9 IC 16-31-12-1. 10 SECTION 3. IC 12-29-5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS 11 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 12 1, 2024]: 13 Chapter 5. Community Cares Initiative Grant Pilot Program 14 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "mobile crisis team" has the 15 meaning set forth in IC 12-21-8-3. 16 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "mobile integrated health care" 17 has the meaning set forth in IC 16-31-12-1. ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104 2 1 Sec. 3. (a) The community cares initiative grant pilot program 2 is established for the purpose of assisting in the cost of starting or 3 expanding mobile integrated health care programs and mobile 4 crisis teams in Indiana. 5 (b) The division of mental health and addiction shall administer 6 the pilot program. A county, city, or town that operates a mobile 7 integrated health care program or mobile crisis team is eligible to 8 participate in the pilot program. 9 (c) The division may award a grant to an eligible entity 10 described in subsection (b) for not more than a three (3) year 11 period. 12 (d) The division may issue a request for funds for the pilot 13 program. 14 Sec. 4. (a) The community cares initiative fund is established for 15 the purposes of funding the community cares initiative grant pilot 16 program. The fund shall be administered by the division of mental 17 health and addiction. 18 (b) The expenses of administering the fund shall be paid from 19 money in the fund. 20 (c) The fund shall consist of: 21 (1) money received from state or federal grants or programs; 22 and 23 (2) gifts, money, and donations received from any other 24 source, including transfers from other funds or accounts. 25 (d) Money in the fund is continuously appropriated for purposes 26 of this section. 27 (e) The treasurer of state shall invest the money in the fund not 28 currently needed to meet the obligations of the fund in the same 29 manner as other public money may be invested. 30 (f) Money in the fund at the end of a state fiscal year does not 31 revert to the state general fund. 32 Sec. 5. Before December 1 of each year, the division of mental 33 health and addiction shall report to the legislative council in an 34 electronic format under IC 5-14-6 the information concerning the 35 community cares initiative grant pilot program and the grants 36 offered to eligible entities. ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104 3 COMMITTEE REPORT Madam President: The Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 10, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS and be reassigned to the Senate Committee on Appropriations. (Reference is to SB 10 as introduced.) CHARBONNEAU, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0 _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Madam President: The Senate Committee on Appropriations, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 10, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows: Delete the title and insert the following: A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning human services and to make an appropriation. Page 1, line 9, delete "IC 12-29-5-2." and insert "IC 16-31-12-1.". Page 1, line 16, after "care"" insert "has the meaning set forth in IC 16-31-12-1.". Page 1, delete line 17. Page 2, delete lines 1 through 9. Page 2, delete lines 29 through 33, begin a new paragraph and insert: "(c) The fund shall consist of: (1) money received from state or federal grants or programs; and (2) gifts, money, and donations received from any other source, including transfers from other funds or accounts. (d) Money in the fund is continuously appropriated for purposes of this section.". Page 2, line 34, delete "(d)" and insert "(e)". Page 2, line 37, delete "(e)" and insert "(f)". Page 2, line 40, delete "general assembly" and insert "legislative council ". ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104 4 and when so amended that said bill do pass. (Reference is to SB 10 as printed January 26, 2024.) MISHLER, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 13, Nays 0. _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Public Health, to which was referred Senate Bill 10, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: Page 2, line 6, delete "city" and insert "county, city,". and when so amended that said bill do pass. (Reference is to SB 10 as printed February 2, 2024.) BARRETT Committee Vote: yeas 13, nays 0. ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104