Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0010 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/13/2024

                    *ES0010.1*
February 13, 2024
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 10
_____
DIGEST OF SB 10 (Updated February 13, 2024 10:58 am - DI 147)
Citations Affected:  IC 12-7; IC 12-29.
Synopsis:  Community cares initiative grant pilot program. Establishes
the community cares initiative grant pilot program for the purpose of
assisting in the costs of starting or expanding mobile integrated health
care programs and mobile crisis teams in Indiana. Establishes the
community cares initiative fund. 
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Baldwin, Crider, Charbonneau, Garten,
Walker K, Carrasco, Bassler, Crane, Busch,
Johnson T, Buck, Gaskill, Niezgodski,
Young M, Becker, Ford J.D., Hunley, Maxwell,
Taylor G, Bohacek, Alexander, Deery, Doriot,
Brown L, Koch, Alting, Goode, Messmer,
Randolph Lonnie M, Dernulc, Qaddoura,
Donato, Yoder, Vinzant, Pol Jr.
(HOUSE SPONSORS — BARRETT, BAIRD, KING)
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider
Services.
January 25, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass; reassigned to Committee on
Appropriations.
February 1, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
February 5, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
February 6, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 48, nays 0.
HOUSE ACTION
February 12, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health.
February 13, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass. Referred to Committee on Ways and
Means pursuant to Rule 127.
ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104  February 13, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 10
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
human services and to make an appropriation.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 12-7-2-131.4, AS ADDED BY P.L.207-2021,
2 SECTION 3, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 131.4. "Mobile crisis team", for purposes of
4 IC 12-21-8 and IC 12-29-5, has the meaning set forth in IC 12-21-8-3.
5 SECTION 2. IC 12-7-2-131.6 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
6 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
7 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 131.6. "Mobile integrated health
8 care", for purposes of IC 12-29-5, has the meaning set forth in
9 IC 16-31-12-1.
10 SECTION 3. IC 12-29-5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS
11 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
12 1, 2024]:
13 Chapter 5. Community Cares Initiative Grant Pilot Program
14 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "mobile crisis team" has the
15 meaning set forth in IC 12-21-8-3.
16 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "mobile integrated health care"
17 has the meaning set forth in IC 16-31-12-1.
ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104 2
1 Sec. 3. (a) The community cares initiative grant pilot program
2 is established for the purpose of assisting in the cost of starting or
3 expanding mobile integrated health care programs and mobile
4 crisis teams in Indiana.
5 (b) The division of mental health and addiction shall administer
6 the pilot program. A county, city, or town that operates a mobile
7 integrated health care program or mobile crisis team is eligible to
8 participate in the pilot program.
9 (c) The division may award a grant to an eligible entity
10 described in subsection (b) for not more than a three (3) year
11 period.
12 (d) The division may issue a request for funds for the pilot
13 program.
14 Sec. 4. (a) The community cares initiative fund is established for
15 the purposes of funding the community cares initiative grant pilot
16 program. The fund shall be administered by the division of mental
17 health and addiction.
18 (b) The expenses of administering the fund shall be paid from
19 money in the fund.
20 (c) The fund shall consist of:
21 (1) money received from state or federal grants or programs;
22 and
23 (2) gifts, money, and donations received from any other
24 source, including transfers from other funds or accounts.
25 (d) Money in the fund is continuously appropriated for purposes
26 of this section.
27 (e) The treasurer of state shall invest the money in the fund not
28 currently needed to meet the obligations of the fund in the same
29 manner as other public money may be invested.
30 (f) Money in the fund at the end of a state fiscal year does not
31 revert to the state general fund.
32 Sec. 5. Before December 1 of each year, the division of mental
33 health and addiction shall report to the legislative council in an
34 electronic format under IC 5-14-6 the information concerning the
35 community cares initiative grant pilot program and the grants
36 offered to eligible entities.
ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Health and Provider
Services, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 10, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS and be
reassigned to the Senate Committee on Appropriations.
 (Reference is to SB 10 as introduced.)
CHARBONNEAU, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Appropriations, to
which was referred Senate Bill No. 10, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
Delete the title and insert the following:
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
human services and to make an appropriation.
Page 1, line 9, delete "IC 12-29-5-2." and insert "IC 16-31-12-1.".
Page 1, line 16, after "care"" insert "has the meaning set forth in
IC 16-31-12-1.".
Page 1, delete line 17.
Page 2, delete lines 1 through 9.
Page 2, delete lines 29 through 33, begin a new paragraph and
insert:
"(c) The fund shall consist of:
(1) money received from state or federal grants or programs;
and
(2) gifts, money, and donations received from any other
source, including transfers from other funds or accounts.
(d) Money in the fund is continuously appropriated for purposes
of this section.".
Page 2, line 34, delete "(d)" and insert "(e)".
 Page 2, line 37, delete "(e)" and insert "(f)".
Page 2, line 40, delete "general assembly" and insert "legislative
council ".
ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104 4
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 10 as printed January 26, 2024.)
MISHLER, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 13, Nays 0.
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Public Health, to which was
referred Senate Bill 10, has had the same under consideration and begs
leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation
that said bill be amended as follows:
Page 2, line 6, delete "city" and insert "county, city,".
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 10 as printed February 2, 2024.)
BARRETT
Committee Vote: yeas 13, nays 0.
ES 10—LS 6773/DI 104