Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 96
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 336: yeas 97, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 305: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Hostettler, Lucas, Haggard and Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Bartels and Pack
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senator Carrasco added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Niezgodski and Glick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Tomes and Vinzant
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 98, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Representative Hamilton added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Representative Judy removed as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Dernulc added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Judy, Pack R, Hostettler
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Bartels
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 12: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Vinzant added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senators Doriot and Raatz added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Young M added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Glick added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Tomes
|
|
|