Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0015 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 13, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note January 22, 2024
Fiscal Note January 18, 2024
Fiscal Note January 16, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023
Fiscal Note December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024
Bill January 16, 2024