Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0030 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/29/2024

                            *ES0030.2*
Reprinted
March 1, 2024
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 30
_____
DIGEST OF SB 30 (Updated February 29, 2024 12:21 pm - DI 151)
Citations Affected:  IC 9-21.
Synopsis:  School bus stop arm violation notification. Provides that
when an individual registers a vehicle, the bureau of motor vehicles
shall provide notice that a person who operates a vehicle and who
recklessly passes a school bus stopped on a roadway or a private road
when the arm signal device is in the device's extended position
commits a Class A misdemeanor. 
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Niemeyer, Buck, Dernulc, Ford J.D.,
Niezgodski
(HOUSE SPONSORS — SLAGER, ANDRADE, ABBOTT, GORE)
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
Transportation.
January 9, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
January 16, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 18, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 33, nays 12.
HOUSE ACTION
February 6, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
February 27, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass.
February 29, 2024, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed.
ES 30—LS 6023/DI 151  Reprinted
March 1, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 30
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
motor vehicles.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 9-21-8-52.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]: Sec. 52.5. When an individual registers a vehicle, the
4 bureau shall provide notice that a person who operates a vehicle
5 and who recklessly passes a school bus stopped on a roadway or a
6 private road when the arm signal device specified in IC 9-21-12-13
7 is in the device's extended position commits a Class A misdemeanor
8 under section 52(b) of this chapter.
ES 30—LS 6023/DI 151 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security
and Transportation, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 30, has had
the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back
to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SB 30 as introduced.)
           
CRIDER, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to
which was referred Senate Bill 30, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows:
Page 2, line 16, delete "investigation," and insert "investigation.".
Page 2, delete lines 17 through 18.
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 30 as printed January 10, 2024.)
PRESSEL
Committee Vote: yeas 12, nays 1.
_____
HOUSE MOTION
Mr. Speaker: I move that Engrossed Senate Bill 30 be amended to
read as follows:
Page 1, line 3, delete "(a) The registered owner of a vehicle used to"
and insert "When an individual registers a vehicle, the bureau shall
provide notice that a person who operates a vehicle and who
recklessly passes".
Page 1, line 4, delete "pass".
Page 1, line 6, delete "B infraction." and insert "A misdemeanor
under section 52(b) of this chapter.".
ES 30—LS 6023/DI 151 3
Page 1, delete lines 7 through 17.
Delete page 2.
(Reference is to ESB 30 as printed February 27, 2024.)
MELTZER
ES 30—LS 6023/DI 151