Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note January 18, 2024
Fiscal Note January 16, 2024
Fiscal Note January 9, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023
Fiscal Note December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024
Bill January 9, 2024