Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Teshka and Bauer M
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Miller D
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Crane added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Pensions and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senator Hunley added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|