Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0034 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note February 5, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023
Fiscal Note December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024